U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00473
  • Case Name: Hof v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 06, 2018: [Stay]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 16, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 16, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 14, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 17, 2017: [Receipt]
  • November 17, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.