U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00426
  • Case Name: Mikolas et al v. University of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 23, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 28, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Statement]
  • June 24, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • June 06, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 20, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 20, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 14, 2019: [Consent Filed]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • January 10, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
  • December 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 03, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 03, 2018: [Sealed Document]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order]
  • September 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 30, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • March 29, 2018: [Stipulation]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 19, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.