U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00474
  • Case Name: Meagher v. City of Plummer
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 12, 2018: [Dismiss]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Amended Minute Entry]
  • September 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • May 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 07, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 01, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 01, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 16, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 15, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 09, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 20, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.