U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00478
  • Case Name: Gillenwater v. Bastian
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 13, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Consolidate Cases]
  • January 23, 2018: [Waive]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • December 26, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 19, 2017: [Writ of Mandamus]
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • November 22, 2017: [Hearing]
  • November 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Complaint]
  • November 21, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.