U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00475
  • Case Name: Carranza v. Idaho Commission of Pardons and Parole et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 03, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • November 21, 2017: [Complaint]
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 21, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.