U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00477
  • Case Name: Esposito v. Ada County Jail
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Request]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Return Mail]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 09, 2018: [Letter]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order]
  • January 03, 2018: [Supplement]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • November 21, 2017: [Complaint]
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 21, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.