U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00471
  • Case Name: Bishop v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • April 27, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 14, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • February 12, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 17, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 21, 2017: [Petition for Review]
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 21, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.