U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00481
  • Case Name: Garcia v. Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 01, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 19, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 19, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.