U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00483
  • Case Name: Allred v. Home Depot USA, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 29, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 05, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Stay]
  • August 27, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief]
  • August 21, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 07, 2019: [Objection to Bill of Costs]
  • August 07, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • August 01, 2019: [File Amicus Brief]
  • August 01, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 30, 2019: [Amicus Curiae Appearance]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order]
  • July 25, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 24, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • July 24, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • July 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 12, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • July 12, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 12, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • July 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 01, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 28, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 21, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • May 16, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 24, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2019: [Exclude]
  • April 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 12, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2019: [Exclude]
  • April 01, 2019: [Strike]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 26, 2019: [Errata]
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 20, 2019: [Exclude]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • February 27, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • February 27, 2019: [Declaration]
  • February 27, 2019: [Statement]
  • February 27, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 27, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 27, 2019: [Seal]
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • January 31, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 29, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 24, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • January 16, 2019: [File Excess Pages]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Declaration]
  • December 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 17, 2018: [Declaration]
  • December 14, 2018: [Compel]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 02, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 02, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order]
  • October 31, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 17, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 16, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 15, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • October 05, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • October 03, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 02, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Renew]
  • October 02, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 23, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 20, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • September 10, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • September 10, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • August 20, 2018: [Renew]
  • August 20, 2018: [Errata]
  • August 17, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • August 15, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 08, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 08, 2018: [Compel]
  • August 08, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 06, 2018: [Compel]
  • August 02, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 01, 2018: [Protective Order]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 24, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Errata]
  • June 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 05, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • May 17, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • May 17, 2018: [Protective Order]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 07, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 23, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • January 22, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 22, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 19, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 21, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 27, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.