U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00485
  • Case Name: Harmon v. City of Pocatello et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Transcript]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • February 06, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 06, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • January 29, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
  • January 10, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 02, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 26, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 10, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • June 07, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 07, 2019: [Strike]
  • June 07, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 28, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 24, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 03, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 15, 2019: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
  • March 01, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 02, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 01, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 06, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2018: [Summons Issued]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 28, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 28, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.