U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00484
  • Case Name: Gillenwater v. Dennis
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 15, 2017: [Writ of Mandamus]
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 28, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 28, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 28, 2017: [Hearing]
  • November 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2017: [Complaint]
  • November 28, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.