U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:06-cv-00448
  • Case Name: Barber v. USA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [USCA Order]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 26, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Reopen Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.