U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00479
  • Case Name: Williams v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Letter]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 29, 2017: [Writ of Mandamus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.