U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00488
  • Case Name: Lopez-Prieto v. Idaho Department of Correction et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 08, 2017: [Consent Filed]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 29, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 29, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 29, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • November 29, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.