U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00487
  • Case Name: Enduris Extrusions, Inc. v. Boise River Fence, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 08, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 08, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 29, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 04, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 21, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 21, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 19, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • November 29, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.