U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cv-00380
  • Case Name: Carr v. Fleming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Reopen Case]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Receipt]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 26, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order to Transport]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Order to Transport]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 08, 2018: [Stay]
  • November 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 01, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • November 01, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 01, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Stay]
  • October 10, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 02, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • September 12, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Supplement]
  • August 30, 2018: [Request]
  • August 30, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 30, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 28, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 20, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 06, 2018: [Recusal]
  • June 05, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 22, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 16, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 07, 2018: [Statement]
  • May 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • May 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [Status Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 06, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 02, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 08, 2018: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Request]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • December 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 30, 2017: [Order Reopening Case]
  • November 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.