U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00489
  • Case Name: Smith v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order]
  • June 07, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [USCA Order]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2018: [Errata]
  • March 12, 2018: [Declaration]
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order]
  • March 05, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 02, 2018: [Docket Call]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 02, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 28, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 27, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Seal]
  • February 21, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • February 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 14, 2018: [Errata]
  • February 09, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 08, 2018: [Transcript]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 05, 2018: [Transcript]
  • February 01, 2018: [Witness List]
  • February 01, 2018: [Exhibit List]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Bench Trial - Begun]
  • January 25, 2018: [Witness List]
  • January 25, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 23, 2018: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order]
  • January 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order]
  • December 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 08, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Summons Issued]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.