U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00490
  • Case Name: Wesco Insurance Company et al v. Yellowstone Partners, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 01, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 01, 2019: [Stay]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 14, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2018: [Joinder]
  • November 16, 2018: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • May 23, 2018: [Disclosure Statement]
  • May 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 10, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 02, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 20, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 15, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 14, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Supplement]
  • December 07, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • December 05, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order of Recusal]
  • December 01, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 01, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.