U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00442
  • Case Name: United States of America v. The Approximate Sum of $205,552.67
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Judgment - Default]
  • May 04, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • April 25, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • April 24, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2018: [Default Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Service by Publication]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Claim]
  • December 01, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.