U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00494
  • Case Name: Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford et al v. United States Department of Justice
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 02, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • January 02, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 02, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 07, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 01, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.