U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00492
  • Case Name: Clyne v. Ada County Sheriff et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Supplement]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 04, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 04, 2017: [Complaint]
  • December 04, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • December 04, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.