U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00493
  • Case Name: Gillenwater v. Kenyon
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 15, 2017: [Writ of Mandamus]
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 07, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 04, 2017: [Hearing]
  • December 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2017: [Complaint]
  • December 04, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.