U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00497
  • Case Name: RM Mechanical, Inc. v. Consolidated Supply Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 15, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order]
  • September 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 23, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 20, 2018: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • April 20, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 20, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 19, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • April 18, 2018: [Third Party Complaint]
  • April 18, 2018: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 07, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 06, 2018: [Third Party Complaint]
  • March 05, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 15, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 15, 2018: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • February 12, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 12, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 23, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 19, 2018: [Third Party Complaint]
  • January 19, 2018: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 12, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • December 12, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 12, 2017: [Supplement]
  • December 12, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 11, 2017: [Third Party Complaint]
  • December 11, 2017: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • December 06, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 06, 2017: [Errata]
  • December 05, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 05, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.