U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00496
  • Case Name: United States of America v. The Estate of Bill G. Bezates et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 24, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • April 13, 2018: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 14, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 26, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2018: [Continue]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.