U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00498
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Dillon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Abstract Issued]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Entry of Judgment]
  • July 24, 2019: [Default Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 19, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2019: [Entry of Default]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order]
  • March 14, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 31, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 29, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 20, 2018: [Quash]
  • November 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Joinder]
  • August 27, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2018: [Joinder]
  • August 15, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 15, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 15, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 10, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 31, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 26, 2018: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • July 17, 2018: [Strike]
  • July 11, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • July 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Third Party Complaint]
  • June 19, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 14, 2018: [Quash]
  • June 14, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2018: [Stay]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 05, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.