U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Acosta v. Idaho Falls School District No. 91
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Judgment - Consent]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment]
  • April 19, 2018: [Approve Consent Judgment]
  • April 06, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 06, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Order]
  • March 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order]
  • March 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Stipulation]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.