U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00499
  • Case Name: Esposito v. Crutchfield
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Letter]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • April 06, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 09, 2018: [Letter]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • December 06, 2017: [Complaint]
  • December 06, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 06, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.