U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00500
  • Case Name: Veltex Building Condominiums Owners' Association, Inc. v. Dow Roofing Systems, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Order Staying Case]
  • February 09, 2018: [Compel]
  • February 06, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 07, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • December 06, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.