U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00501
  • Case Name: Mendoza-Jimenes v. Winchester et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Order]
  • December 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 24, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 24, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 05, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Dismiss]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • December 06, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • December 06, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.