U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00502
  • Case Name: Bergesen v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 05, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • March 05, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 22, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 12, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 25, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 17, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 10, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 14, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • December 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 11, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 11, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 07, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.