U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00506
  • Case Name: Metz et al v. Rainey
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Order]
  • February 12, 2018: [Judgment - Consent]
  • February 12, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 22, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 19, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 12, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • January 12, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 10, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Supplement]
  • December 19, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 18, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 14, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • December 11, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.