U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00503
  • Case Name: Lehmkuhl v. Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 01, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 05, 2018: [Protective Order]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 28, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • February 20, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 20, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • February 12, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • December 18, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 14, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 13, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.