U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00505
  • Case Name: Davis v. Atencio et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 07, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Dismiss]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 07, 2019: [Stay]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 24, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 11, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2018: [Issuance]
  • December 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 20, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 20, 2018: [Request]
  • November 14, 2018: [Issuance]
  • November 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 07, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2018: [Sanctions]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 23, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • October 09, 2018: [Stay]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 28, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 28, 2018: [Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 21, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 24, 2018: [Declaration]
  • July 18, 2018: [Service]
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 05, 2018: [Service]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 20, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 01, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 13, 2017: [Complaint]
  • December 13, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 13, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.