U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00329
  • Case Name: Drennon v. Idaho Legislative Representatives et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 23, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Return Mail]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Return Mail]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • February 06, 2019: [Response (generic)]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order]
  • January 28, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 23, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 23, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • December 04, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 05, 2018: [Clarify]
  • November 05, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 05, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order]
  • October 25, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 23, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 23, 2018: [Declaration]
  • October 23, 2018: [Supplement]
  • October 23, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2018: [Supplement]
  • October 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 26, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • September 26, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 17, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [Letter]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 24, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Declaration]
  • June 15, 2018: [Return Mail]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 29, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order]
  • May 04, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2018: [Letter]
  • April 24, 2018: [Letter]
  • April 18, 2018: [Letter]
  • April 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 03, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Letter]
  • March 13, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 22, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • January 18, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • January 18, 2018: [Hearing]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Letter]
  • December 20, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 20, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • December 15, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 14, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.