U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00508
  • Case Name: Handleson v. Director of Idaho Department of Correction
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Return Mail]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 14, 2017: [Complaint]
  • December 14, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • December 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.