U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00509
  • Case Name: Rios-Lopez v. Idaho Department of Correction et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order]
  • February 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 26, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • December 10, 2018: [Return Mail]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 13, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • November 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • December 15, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • December 15, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • December 15, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.