U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00511
  • Case Name: Gillenwater v. Rosser
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 15, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 15, 2017: [Writ of Mandamus]
  • December 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2017: [Complaint]
  • December 15, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.