U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00510
  • Case Name: Truesdale v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order]
  • July 31, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 31, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Letter]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 04, 2018: [Consent Filed]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 18, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • December 18, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 18, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • December 18, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • December 18, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.