U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00512
  • Case Name: L.E. v. Lakeland Joint School District No. 272 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 07, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 07, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Errata]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 14, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 05, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 15, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 08, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 13, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 06, 2019: [Sealed Document]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Strike]
  • February 20, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2019: [Sealed Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order]
  • November 30, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 29, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • November 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 28, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 27, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • November 27, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • November 19, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 24, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 24, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 18, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 13, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 06, 2018: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 12, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 08, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • December 18, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • December 18, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.