U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00513
  • Case Name: Brown v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • December 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 12, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • October 16, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • May 01, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • May 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2018: [Stay]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 10, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • December 20, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 20, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.