U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00515
  • Case Name: Wall v. Idaho Commission of Pardons & Parole et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [USCA Order]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 02, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 01, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • December 20, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 20, 2017: [Complaint]
  • December 20, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • December 20, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.