U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00514
  • Case Name: Randall v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Stipulation]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 29, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • April 25, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 23, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 20, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 20, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • December 20, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 20, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 20, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 20, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 20, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.