U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00517
  • Case Name: Wesemann et al v. Hansen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 06, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 02, 2019: [Joinder]
  • August 02, 2019: [In Limine]
  • August 01, 2019: [Joinder]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Affidavit in Support]
  • July 31, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 19, 2019: [Affidavit of Service]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 15, 2019: [Joinder]
  • May 15, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 03, 2019: [Errata]
  • May 02, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 02, 2019: [Joinder]
  • May 01, 2019: [Sanctions]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Order]
  • October 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 27, 2018: [Status Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Compel]
  • August 06, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 27, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 15, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 15, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 15, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 14, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 12, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 01, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Status Report]
  • January 29, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 24, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 24, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • December 20, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.