U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00516
  • Case Name: Martinez v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 10, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 11, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 10, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • August 10, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • July 11, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • June 08, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Order]
  • April 11, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 21, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • December 20, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 20, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 20, 2017: [Complaint]
  • December 20, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.