U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00520
  • Case Name: HOMESTYLE DIRECT LLC v. ASSOCIATED PACKAGING, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 30, 2018: [Dismiss]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 19, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 22, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • December 22, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.