U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00523
  • Case Name: Pavestone Capital, LLC v. Hot Route Delivery Specialists, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Judgment - Default]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2018: [Judgment - Default]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 02, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 15, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Entry of Default]
  • February 15, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 08, 2018: [Entry of Default]
  • February 08, 2018: [Default Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Certificate of Counsel]
  • January 22, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 16, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 10, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 05, 2018: [Errata]
  • January 03, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 03, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 22, 2017: [Designations of Record]
  • December 22, 2017: [Transcript]
  • December 22, 2017: [Certificate of Readiness]
  • December 22, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 22, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.