U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00522
  • Case Name: Lewis v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 16, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 26, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 10, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2018: [Declaration]
  • May 09, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Administrative Record]
  • March 15, 2018: [Answer to Petition for Review]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 23, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Receipt]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 22, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 22, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • December 22, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 22, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 22, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.