U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00525
  • Case Name: Gallegos v. Corizon LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Response to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 27, 2019: [Compel]
  • September 27, 2019: [Stay]
  • September 27, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 04, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Consent Filed]
  • January 04, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 03, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 03, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 03, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • December 04, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 04, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Order]
  • May 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 26, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 26, 2017: [Complaint]
  • December 26, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 26, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.