U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00529
  • Case Name: Ortega v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Supplement]
  • April 01, 2022: [Seal Case]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Produce]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Expedite]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Expedite]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Request]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2019: [Letter]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 18, 2019: [Traverse]
  • April 03, 2019: [Letter]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Request]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Request]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • October 17, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Seal]
  • September 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2018: [Letter]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 31, 2018: [Order]
  • August 31, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 31, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 23, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 08, 2018: [Letter]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 12, 2018: [Compel]
  • June 12, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Request]
  • May 17, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • April 05, 2018: [Letter]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 29, 2018: [1-Exparte Document-to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
  • March 20, 2018: [Compel]
  • March 14, 2018: [Supplement]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 08, 2018: [Compel]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • December 27, 2017: [Request]
  • December 27, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.