U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00527
  • Case Name: Padilla v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Return Mail]
  • November 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 14, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 14, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Response to Habeas Petition]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 06, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 06, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • November 20, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 15, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Receipt]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • December 27, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.